Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia

Archidioecesis Sanctae Fidei de Antioquia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 June 1988
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 9,925 (3,833 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquisantioquia.co/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Plazuela Martinez Pardo - Calle 9A N. 12-11, Santa Fe de Antioquia, Antioquia, Colombia
  • Telephone: (4)853-13-08; 853.11.02
  • Fax: 853-11-44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Antioquía
31 August 1804ErectedDiocese of Cartagena
Diocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Antioquía (erected)
14 February 1868Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía Diocese of Medellín (erected)
28 April 1908Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía Prefecture Apostolic of Chocó (erected)
5 February 1917Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos (erected)
Diocese of Antioquía-Jericó
5 February 1917UnitedDiocese of Antioquía
Diocese of Jericó
Diocese of Antioquía-Jericó
Diocese of Antioquía
3 July 1941SplitDiocese of Antioquía-Jericó Diocese of Antioquía
Diocese of Jericó
3 July 1941Territory AddedDiocese of Jericó (Anzá, Caicedo, and Urrao)
Prefecture Apostolic of Urabá (suppressed)
Diocese of Antioquía
14 November 1952Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía (Riosucio and Aeandi)
Prefecture Apostolic of Chocó (Quibdó and Bagado)
Vicariate Apostolic of Quibdó (erected)
18 June 1988Territory LostDiocese of Antioquía (Urabá antioqueno)
Vicariate Apostolic of Quibdó (Urabá chocoani)
Diocese of Apartadó (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia
18 June 1988ElevatedDiocese of Antioquía Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia
22 November 2003Territory AddedDiocese of Santa Rosa de Osos (Ebéjico, Liborina, Peque, San Jerónimo, Sopetrán, Sabanalarga, Olaya, and part of Palmitas) Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia
22 November 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia (Murindó and Vigía del Fuerte) Diocese of Quibdó

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Antioquía
1950184,0001,894,9009.7%53533,4717423ap1951
1959198,500198,92699.8%40404,9629019ap1960
1964197,575198,87699.3%47474,2039722ap1967
1968263,080286,01292.0%51515,15813419ap1971
1976286,100298,10096.0%655704,087516034ap1977
1980314,254327,45496.0%593625,068415234ap1981
Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia
1990150,700164,00091.9%598672,249286427ap1991
1999150,000160,00093.8%76761,97337925ap2000
2000150,000160,00093.8%91121031,4564128527ap2001
2001150,000160,00093.8%682702,142129027ap2002
2002160,000180,00088.9%72722,2224525ap2003
2003140,000150,00093.3%73731,9172854525ap2004
2004160,000180,00088.9%70702,2852855025ap2005
2010249,000272,00091.5%97972,5673857748ap2011
2014250,200282,40088.6%86862,9093857648ap2015
2017247,970280,94088.3%92922,695855648ap2018
2020246,020280,65087.7%91912,7035448ap2021
2022251,313286,46187.7%96962,6174949ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Antioquía
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 109
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 155, to Page 156
  • Diocese of Antioquía-Jericó
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 59, and Page 246
  • Diocese of Antioquía
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 33, Page 410, and Page 411
  • Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 80, Page 1,382, and Page 1,383
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 96, Page 316, and Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 May 2024