Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felicissimus Alphonse Raeymaeckers, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1915Born
3 Jun 193924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Aug 196348.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan
5 Aug 196348.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aperlae
20 Oct 196348.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aperlae
29 Sep 196651.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan
12 Mar 196752.0SucceededBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
10 Jul 197560.3ResignedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
24 Jun 197863.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Felicissimus Alphonse Raeymaeckers
Bishop Felicissimus Alphonse Raeymaeckers O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestmeerbeek
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast