Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Pulickal

Bishop of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1964 Born
1 Jan 199126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Jan 201651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Jan 201651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
4 Feb 201651.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
15 Jan 202055.8AppointedBishop of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India
3 Feb 202055.9InstalledBishop of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Jose Pulickal (VIAF: 51150319)
Bishop Jose Pulickal (born ) Bishop of Kanjirapally

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInchiyani
Ordained BishopSaint Dominic, Cathedral, Kanjirapally, Diocese of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2016
  • c1: CB, 12 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,838
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2020
  • i: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast