Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rutilo Felipe Pozos Lorenzini

Bishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1967 Born
29 Jun 199326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
6 Dec 201346.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
6 Dec 201346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafis
3 Mar 201447.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafis
15 Sep 202053.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
14 Nov 202053.7InstalledBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Rutilo Felipe Pozos Lorenzini
Bishop Rutilo Felipe Pozos Lorenzini (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Obregón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRancho San Diego
Ordained BishopCentro Expositor y de Convenciones, Puebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Obregón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 3 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,111
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2020
  • i: CB, 14 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast