Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Valbuena Sánchez

Bishop Emeritus of Colima, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1929 Born
21 May 195526.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 197243.8AppointedPrelate of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México
9 Dec 197243.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
8 Feb 197344.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
1 Mar 197647.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México
21 Mar 198859.1AppointedBishop of La Paz en la Baja California Sur, México
8 Jul 198960.4AppointedBishop of Colima, México
9 Jun 200576.3RetiredBishop of Colima, México

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Valbuena Sánchez
Bishop Gilberto Valbuena Sánchez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChietla
Ordained BishopSan Jeronimo, Cathedral, Tacámbaro, Diocese of Tacámbaro, Michoacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast