Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severinah Abdon Potani, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solwezi, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1919Born
17 Aug 194930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
9 Jun 197050.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solwezi, Zambia
9 Dec 197657.4AppointedBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
20 Feb 197757.6Ordained BishopBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
26 Dec 199374.4DiedBishop of Solwezi, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Severinah Abdon Potani
Bishop Severinah Abdon Potani O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Solwezi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetauke
Ordained BishopSolwezi, Diocese of Solwezi

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast