Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Raphael p’Mony Wokorach, M.C.C.I.

Bishop-Elect of Nebbi, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1961 Born
29 Apr 198928.2First VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
12 Oct 199231.7Perpetual VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
25 Sep 199332.6Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
31 Mar 202160.1AppointedBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
26 Jun 202160.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbi, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Raphael p’Mony Wokorach
Father Raphael p’Mony Wokorach M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Nebbi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOjigo, Diocese of Arua
Ordained PriestChurch, Wadelai, Diocese of Arua
Ordained BishopNebbi, Diocese of Nebbi

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Nebbi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2021
  • firs/c1: CB, 31 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 22 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Apr 2021

Quantcast