Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop David James Mathew

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1902Born
25 Jun 192927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
3 Dec 193836.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 193836.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeliae
21 Dec 193836.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeliae
20 Feb 194644.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to British Eastern and Western Africa
20 Feb 194644.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
16 Apr 195452.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military
23 Mar 196361.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military
12 Dec 197573.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

MicroData Summary for David James Mathew (VIAF: 88862149)
Archbishop David James Mathew (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyme Regis, Dorset, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Ordained PriestCollegio Beda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSts. John and Elizabeth, Hospital, St. John's Wood, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1938, Number 104
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 151
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 275, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 352, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 421, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 530, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 860, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,073, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast