Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Laurean Cardinal Rugambwa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

Cardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1912Born
12 Dec 194331.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
13 Dec 195139.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kagera Inferiore, Tanzania
13 Dec 195139.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
10 Feb 195239.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
25 Mar 195340.7AppointedBishop of Rutabo, Tanzania
28 Mar 196047.7Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 196047.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Francesco d’Assisi a Ripa Grande
21 Jun 196047.9AppointedBishop of Bukoba, Tanzania
19 Dec 196856.4AppointedArchbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
22 Jul 199280.0RetiredArchbishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
8 Dec 199785.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Laurean Rugambwa
Laurean Cardinal Rugambwa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dar-es-Salaam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukongo
Ordained PriestKatigondo
Ordained BishopChurch, Rutabo
Death PlaceDar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
Buried Place (Original)Church, Kashozi
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Bukoba, Diocese of Bukoba

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
  • a cardinal for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 11
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 275, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 352, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 421, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 530, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 860, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,073, Ascendance
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast