Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Qian Yurong (Quan Yirong)

Deceased

Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1914²Born
1945²31.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 195945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China
2007²93.0ConfirmedBishop
18 May 201197.3RetiredBishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China
22 Mar 201399.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Xuzhou [Süchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Qian Yurong (Quan Yirong)
Bishop Thomas Qian Yurong (Quan Yirong) (born 1914, died ) Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongshan
Ordained BishopNanking, Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
Death PlaceXuzhou, Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow]

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 53.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2014, Page 1,144
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,072
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast