Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tarcisio Pisani, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1929Born
28 Nov 195425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
28 Jun 198252.9AppointedBishop of Gravina, Italy
28 Jun 198252.9AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
12 Sep 198253.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina, Italy
30 Sep 198657.2AppointedBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
14 Mar 199464.6DiedBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Pisani
Bishop Tarcisio Pisani O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorano Calabro
Ordained BishopSan Francesco di Paola, Basilica, Paola, Archdiocese of Cosenza e Bisignano

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,142
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast