Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Huy Quang

Deceased

Bishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1910Born
30 Nov 194030.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 196049.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hung Ho, Viet Nam
5 Mar 196049.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
23 Apr 196050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
24 Nov 196050.6AppointedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
13 Nov 198575.5DiedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyễn Huy Quang
Bishop Pierre Nguyễn Huy Quang (born , died ) Bishop of Hưng Ha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinh Loc
Ordained BishopHanoi

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1960, Number 28
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast