Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Protestant Mister Emmanuel Milingo]

Protestant

Not in Union with the Holy See

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church; laicised)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1930 Born
31 Aug 195828.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 196938.9AppointedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
1 Aug 196939.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
6 Aug 198353.1ResignedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
24 Sep 200676.2Excommunicated
17 Dec 200979.5Laicized

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Milingo (VIAF: 84035974)
Mister Emmanuel Milingo (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMnukwa
Ordained BishopKololo Terrace, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala, Uganda

  • a priest for 51.2 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 40.3 years (Laicized)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast