Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urbain-Marie Person, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Harar, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Cyme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1906Born
28 Feb 193226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jan 195245.9AppointedPrefect of Awasa, Ethiopia
2 Jan 195245.9AppointedPrefect of Hosanna, Ethiopia
3 Jul 195549.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Harar, Ethiopia
3 Jul 195549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
28 Aug 195549.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
16 Feb 197367.0ResignedPrefect of Awasa, Ethiopia
16 Feb 197367.0ResignedPrefect of Hosanna, Ethiopia
4 Dec 198175.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Harar, Ethiopia
9 Feb 199488.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Harar, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Urbain-Marie Person
Bishop Urbain-Marie Person O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Harar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanarvily, France

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 69
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast