Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Abraha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1918Born
12 Mar 194425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
9 Apr 196143.0AppointedBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
8 Oct 196143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
17 Jul 198466.2ResignedBishop of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
26 Mar 200081.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for François Abraha
Bishop François Abraha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Asmara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsmara, Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Asmara, Eparchy of Asmara (Ethiopian)
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1961, Number 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022