Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando José Penteado

Bishop Emeritus of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1934 Born
8 Dec 196026.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
2 Apr 197944.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
2 Apr 197944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
27 May 197944.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
5 Jul 200065.9AppointedBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
16 Jul 200066.0InstalledBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
23 Jun 201075.9RetiredBishop of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando José Penteado
Bishop Fernando José Penteado (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jacarezinho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jacarezinho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Mar 2021

Quantcast