Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Pathalil

Bishop Emeritus of Udaipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1937 Born
21 Sep 196326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ajmer and Jaipur, India
3 Dec 198447.8AppointedBishop of Udaipur, India
14 Feb 198548.0Ordained BishopBishop of Udaipur, India
21 Dec 201275.9RetiredBishop of Udaipur, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pathalil
Bishop Joseph Pathalil (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Udaipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNedumkunnam
Ordained BishopN.D. de Fatima, Udaipur, Diocese of Udaipur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Udaipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast