Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloísio Roque Oppermann, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1936Born
29 Jun 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
22 Jan 198346.5AppointedBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Apr 198346.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Nov 198852.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 May 199154.9SucceededBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Feb 199659.6AppointedArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Mar 201275.7RetiredArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Apr 201477.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Roque Oppermann
Archbishop Aloísio Roque Oppermann S.C.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Uberaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Vendelino
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ituiutaba, Diocese of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2012
  • d: CB, 27 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 9,164
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast