Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
7 June 1908 | Erected | Diocese of São Paulo (Vale do Paraíba Paulista, the São Paulo side of Serra da Mantiqueira and Serra do Mar, and the North Coast) | Diocese of Taubaté (erected) |
4 July 1924 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Botucatu
Archdiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Taubaté | Diocese of Sorocaba (erected) |
31 July 1937 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Taubaté (Lorena, Areias, Bananal, Cachoeira, Campos Novos de Cunha, Cruzeiro, Cunha, Embaú, Pinheiros, Piquete, Queluz, São José do Barreiro, and Silveiras) | Diocese of Lorena (erected) |
3 May 1952 | Territory Added | Archdiocese of São Paulo
Diocese of Taubaté | |
14 February 1958 | Territory Added | Diocese of Santos (Ubatuba and Caraguatatuba) | Diocese of Taubaté |
19 April 1958 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of São Paulo (Parts of Aparecida)
Diocese of Taubaté (Guaratingueta and Lagoinha, and Parts of Aparecida) | Archdiocese of Aparecida (erected) |
19 April 1958 | Metropolitan Changed | Diocese of Taubaté (from São Paulo) | |
9 June 1962 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of São Paulo (Mogi das Cruzes, Arujá, Ferraz de Vasconcellos, Guararema, Guarulhos, Itaquaquecetuba, Poá, and Suzano)
Diocese of Taubaté (Igaratá, Salesopólis, and Santa Isabel) | Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes (erected) |
30 January 1981 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes (Igaratá)
Diocese of Taubaté (Sao José dos Campos, Jacareí, Paraibuna, Santa Branca, and Monteiro Lobato) | Diocese of São José dos Campos (erected) |
24 March 1982 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Taubaté (Caraguatatuba and Ubatuba) | Diocese of Santos |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1950 | 380,000 | 400,000 | 95.0% | 69 | 57 | 126 | 3,015 | 113 | 384 | 30 | ap1951 | |
1966 | 370,000 | 415,000 | 89.2% | 61 | 45 | 106 | 3,490 | 105 | 592 | 31 | ap1967 | |
1970 | 420,685 | 460,000 | 91.5% | 50 | 50 | 8,413 | 38 | ap1971 | ||||
1976 | 480,356 | 510,432 | 94.1% | 47 | 43 | 90 | 5,337 | 11 | 100 | 556 | 43 | ap1977 |
1980 | 631,000 | 701,000 | 90.0% | 42 | 46 | 88 | 7,170 | 11 | 109 | 512 | 45 | ap1981 |
1990 | 410,000 | 445,171 | 92.1% | 34 | 37 | 71 | 5,774 | 8 | 89 | 292 | 26 | ap1991 |
1999 | 467,947 | 525,577 | 89.0% | 44 | 41 | 85 | 5,505 | 25 | 125 | 302 | 30 | ap2000 |
2000 | 476,773 | 535,589 | 89.0% | 48 | 45 | 93 | 5,126 | 24 | 136 | 293 | 31 | ap2001 |
2001 | 498,742 | 566,753 | 88.0% | 47 | 49 | 96 | 5,195 | 24 | 135 | 250 | 31 | ap2002 |
2002 | 487,173 | 573,173 | 85.0% | 45 | 43 | 88 | 5,536 | 27 | 150 | 121 | 33 | ap2003 |
2003 | 493,000 | 580,000 | 85.0% | 43 | 44 | 87 | 5,666 | 41 | 129 | 222 | 33 | ap2004 |
2004 | 494,000 | 595,219 | 83.0% | 47 | 47 | 94 | 5,255 | 44 | 130 | 218 | 33 | ap2005 |
2010 | 567,000 | 666,000 | 85.1% | 59 | 44 | 103 | 5,504 | 53 | 173 | 264 | 37 | ap2011 |
2014 | 597,000 | 698,000 | 85.5% | 71 | 55 | 126 | 4,738 | 54 | 192 | 261 | 43 | ap2015 |
2017 | 462,182 | 705,466 | 65.5% | 76 | 60 | 136 | 3,398 | 54 | 181 | 193 | 49 | ap2018 |
2020 | 483,000 | 738,000 | 65.4% | 76 | 50 | 126 | 3,833 | 52 | 166 | 205 | 49 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Oct 2023 |
✠