Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro José de Ochoa y Morillo

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1732³Born
25 Feb 178249.9AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
30 Jun 178250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
11 Apr 179159.0AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1796¹63.7DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Alejandro José de Ochoa y Morillo
Bishop Alejandro José de Ochoa y Morillo (born , died 1796) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Plata
Ordained BishopChuquisaca

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188, and Page 323
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 24
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast