Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Nsayi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nkayi, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1943Born
17 Jun 197128.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 199047.5AppointedBishop of Nkayi, Congo
16 Sep 199047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nkayi, Congo
16 Oct 200158.7ResignedBishop of Nkayi, Congo
12 Feb 202178.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nkayi, Congo

MicroData Summary for Bernard Nsayi
Bishop Bernard Nsayi (born 1943, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nkayi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMindouli
Ordained BishopNkayi, Diocese of Nkayi
Death PlacePoliclinico Gemelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,077
  • d: CB, 12 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast