Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nkayi

Dioecesis Nkayiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Daniel Mizonzo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 December 1983
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pointe-Noire
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo
  • Square Kilometers: 33,310 (12,865 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, B.P. 216, Nkayi; B.P. 200, Brazzaville, Rep. du Congo
  • Telephone: 06.673.41.34; 05.579.85.16

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 December 1983ErectedDiocese of Pointe-Noire Diocese of Nkayi (erected)
24 May 2013Territory LostDiocese of Nkayi Diocese of Dolisie (erected)
30 May 2020Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Dolisie (from Brazzaville)
Diocese of Nkayi (from Brazzaville)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1990145,972414,41535.2%2020403,649264718ap1991
1997257,083485,84352.9%4215574,510306519ap2001
2001192,216468,69641.0%423454,27172518ap2002
2002193,216478,69640.4%424464,20072518ap2003
2003300,500485,84361.9%463496,13242518ap2004
2004250,000490,00051.0%392416,09742317ap2005
2012317,370583,00054.4%565615,202103227ap2013
2013124,216300,59641.3%596651,911113714ap2014
2016325,000534,00060.9%434476,914102420ap2017
2019353,700581,00060.9%38389,30762516ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast