Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Nguyễn Mạnh Hiếu

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Ammaedara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1966 Born
9 May 199832.0Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Nov 200943.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Nov 200943.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
13 Jan 201043.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ammaedara

MicroData Summary for Vincent Nguyễn Mạnh Hiếu
Bishop Vincent Nguyễn Mạnh Hiếu (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaigon, Viet Nam
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Cathedral, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 25 Jan 2021

Quantcast