Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Philip Camilleri

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1969 Born
12 May 200738.0Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
28 Nov 202051.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
28 Nov 202051.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia
25 Jan 202151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Philip Camilleri
Bishop Ivan Philip Camilleri (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSliema, Malta
Ordained BishopSt. Michael's, Cathedral Basilica, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • bp: CB, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 25 Jan 2021

Quantcast