Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Ngande

Deceased

Bishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920Born
3 Jun 195030.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 197050.0AppointedBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
5 Apr 197050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
28 Feb 197858.1DiedBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Denis Ngande
Bishop Denis Ngande (born 1920, died ) Bishop of Bafoussam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBabouantou
Ordained BishopBafoussam, Diocese of Bafoussam

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast