Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Clemente Neto, C.S.Sp.

Prelate Emeritus of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1940 Born
14 Aug 196626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 Jul 198039.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Oct 198040.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Dec 198242.3SucceededPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Oct 200060.1ResignedPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Clemente Neto
Bishop Mário Clemente Neto C.S.Sp. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Tefé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItaúna
Ordained BishopItaúna

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Tefé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast