Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sérgio Eduardo Castriani, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1954Born
2 Feb 197823.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Dec 197824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 May 199843.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
9 Aug 199844.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Oct 200046.3SucceededPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Dec 201258.5AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Nov 201965.4ResignedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
3 Mar 202166.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio Eduardo Castriani
Archbishop Sérgio Eduardo Castriani C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manaus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegente Feijó
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tefé, Territorial Prelature of Tefé, Amazonas
Death PlaceManaus, Archdiocese of Manaus, Amazonas

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,367
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2019
  • d: CB, 3 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jun 2021

Quantcast