Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chrisostom Ndimbo

Bishop of Mbinga, Tanzania

Apostolic Administrator of Njombe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1960 Born
21 Jun 198928.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mbinga, Tanzania
12 Mar 201150.4AppointedBishop of Mbinga, Tanzania
5 Jun 201150.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mbinga, Tanzania
13 Apr 202160.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Njombe, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for John Chrisostom Ndimbo
Bishop John Chrisostom Ndimbo (born ) Bishop of Mbinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKipololo
Ordained BishopSaint Kilian, Cathedral, Mbinga, Diocese of Mbinga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,071
  • aadm: CB, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast