Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eusebio Samwel Kyando

Bishop-Elect of Njombe, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1964 Born
19 Sep 199632.5Ordained PriestPriest of Njombe, Tanzania
19 Oct 202359.6AppointedBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
14 Jan 202459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Njombe, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Samwel Kyando
(WikiData: Q123126734)
Father Eusebio Samwel Kyando (born ) Bishop-Elect of Njombe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNjombe
Ordained BishopNjombe, Diocese of Njombe

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Njombe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2023
  • ob: CB, 11 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Nov 2023