Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Leszek Musiałek, S.C.I.

Bishop of De Aar, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1957 Born
11 Sep 197720.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
6 Dec 198124.5Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
9 Jun 198326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Jul 200952.1AppointedBishop of De Aar, South Africa
24 Sep 200952.3Ordained BishopBishop of De Aar, South Africa
1 Sep 201760.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Aliwal, South Africa
15 Feb 202062.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Adam Leszek Musiałek
Bishop Adam Leszek Musiałek S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of De Aar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWieruszˇw, Poland
Ordained BishopDe Aar, Diocese of De Aar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of De Aar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,281
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast