Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Moizo

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1915Born
18 Jul 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 197257.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Acqui, Italy
22 Jan 197257.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
5 Mar 197257.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
1 Jul 197661.4SucceededBishop of Acqui, Italy
2 Feb 197964.0DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Moizo
Bishop Giuseppe Moizo (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaliceto
Ordained BishopVicoforte

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast