Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter McLaughlin

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1760²Born
1790²30.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 180242.3AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
24 Aug 180242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
12 Jan 181959.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Derry, Ireland
29 Jul 181959.5ResignedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
11 May 182464.3AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
18 Aug 184080.6DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter McLaughlin
Bishop Peter McLaughlin (born 1760, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonaghmore, Co. Donegal
Buried Place (Original)Long Tower North graveyard, Derry, Diocese of Derry

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 174, and Page 317
  • c2: ATh, 9 Nov 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,631
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 73
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast