Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Keeffe

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702²Born
10 Nov 175149.8SelectedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
19 Jan 175250.0ConfirmedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
21 Mar 175250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
1 Mar 175856.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ossory, Ireland
9 Jan 175957.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ossory, Ireland
18 Sep 178785.7DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Keeffe
Bishop James O’Keeffe (born 1702, died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWexford
Death PlaceCarlow
Buried Place (Original)Paupers, Cemetery, near river Barrow

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248, and Page 321
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,478
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 9
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,982
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 99, and Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast