Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh O’Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1750²Born
1 Feb 182070.0AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
16 Apr 182070.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
14 Aug 182575.6DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh O’Kelly
Bishop Hugh O’Kelly (born 1750, died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrickcossan, Co. Down
Ordained BishopNewry

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 19
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast