Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Kernan

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1771²Born
179524.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 181847.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clogher, Ireland
6 Feb 181847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
12 Apr 181847.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
19 Nov 182453.8SucceededBishop of Clogher, Ireland
20 Feb 184473.1DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Kernan
Bishop Edward Kernan (born 1771, died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnniskillen, Co. Ferma
Death PlaceCarrickmackross
Buried Place (Original)Magheross graveyard

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 26
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 56, and Page 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast