Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Bernard Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹Born
20 Nov 174848.8SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
17 Dec 174848.9ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
9 Feb 174949.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
30 Apr 175858.3DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Bernard Dunne
Bishop James Bernard Dunne (born 1700, died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Kildare and Leighlin

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 1
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 40, and Page 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast