Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick McGettigan

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1785¹Born
11 Jul 182035.5AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
17 Sep 182035.7Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
1 May 186176.3DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick McGettigan
Bishop Patrick McGettigan (born 1785, died ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmacrenan, Co. Donegal
Ordained BishopBallyshannon
Death PlaceRathmullan
Buried Place (Original)Letterkenny

  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,633
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 42
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 72
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast