Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Kelly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1793¹Born
23 Sep 182027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
16 Jun 182633.4AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
27 Aug 182633.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
23 Dec 182835.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
24 Jul 183239.5SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
13 Jan 183542.0DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kelly
Archbishop Thomas Kelly (born 1793, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonaghmore, Co. Tyrone
Ordained BishopNewry

  • a priest for 14.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90, and Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,312
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast