Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard O’Reilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1746²Born
11 Mar 177023.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 177023.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 178134.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
20 Jun 178134.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
26 Feb 178235.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland
29 Nov 178741.4SucceededArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
31 Jan 181871.5DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard O’Reilly
Archbishop Richard O’Reilly (born Jul 1746, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKilcock, Chapel
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Church, Drogheda

  • a priest for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101, and Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 27
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast