Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Curtis

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747¹Born
27 Aug 181972.6AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
28 Oct 181972.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
24 Jul 183285.5DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Curtis
Archbishop Patrick Curtis (born 1747, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStamullen, Co. Meath

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 63
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast