Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacNicholas

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1780²Born
1804²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 181838.2AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
17 May 181838.3Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
11 Feb 185272.1DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacNicholas
Bishop Patrick MacNicholas (born 1780, died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillasser, Co. Mayo
Ordained BishopMaynooth

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 57
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 30
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 77, and Page 78
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast