Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valdir Mamede

Bishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1961 Born
1981²19.4ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 May 198826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
2006²44.4IncardinatedPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
6 Feb 201351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
6 Feb 201351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Naissus
16 Mar 201351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naissus
10 Jul 201957.9AppointedBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Aug 201958.1InstalledBishop of Catanduva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valdir Mamede
Bishop Valdir Mamede (born ) Bishop of Catanduva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilvianópolis, Diocese of Pouso Alegre
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Aparecida, Cathedral, Brasilia, Archdiocese of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catanduva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 2 Mar 2013
  • c1/cmf: CB, 20 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,664
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2019
  • i: CB, 10 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast