Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Joseph Malone

Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1946 Born
20 May 197226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
27 Jan 200053.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
27 Jan 200053.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aptuca
1 Mar 200053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aptuca
10 Feb 200457.8AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
31 Mar 200458.0InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
29 May 201266.1AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
10 Aug 201266.3InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
4 Dec 201973.7ResignedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Joseph Malone
Bishop Richard Joseph Malone (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalem
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buffalo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,704
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 May 2012
  • i: CB, 29 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast