Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen MacEgan, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland

Apostolic Administrator of Clonmacnoise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1681²Born
12 Sep 172544.6SelectedBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
20 Sep 172544.7ConfirmedBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
29 Sep 172544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
14 Sep 172948.7SelectedBishop of Meath, Ireland
26 Sep 172948.7ConfirmedBishop of Meath, Ireland
26 Sep 172948.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
30 May 175675.4DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen MacEgan
Bishop Stephen MacEgan O.P. (born 1681, died ) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopQuirinal Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)St. James' churchyard, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162, and Page 263
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 39
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast