Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colman O’Shaughnessy, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1675²Born
1706²31.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Sep 173661.7SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
5 Oct 173661.7ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
Dec 1736³61.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
2 Sep 174873.6DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Colman O’Shaughnessy
Bishop Colman O’Shaughnessy O.P. (born 1675, died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceGowan, Co. Kilkenny
Buried Place (Original)Maudlin Street churchyard

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,618
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast