Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Richardson, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701²Born
1718²17.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 172423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Feb 174746.0AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
1 May 174746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
29 Jan 175352.0DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurence Richardson
Bishop Laurence Richardson O.P. (born 1701, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained PriestPalace of the Archbishop, Malines
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceChannel Row
Buried Place (Original)St. James', Cemetery

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 6
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,504
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 115, and Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast