Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael O’Reilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690¹Born
1710¹20.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 173949.2SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
24 Apr 173949.3ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
23 Sep 173949.7Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
23 Dec 174858.9SelectedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
23 Jan 174959.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
19 Apr 1758³68.2DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Reilly
Archbishop Michael O’Reilly (born 1690, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Chord, outside of Laruence's Gate, Cemetery, Drogheda

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 194
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 51
  • c4: ATh, 5 Nov 2015
  • c4/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast