Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kilkelly (Killikelly), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Bishop of Kilfenora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1699²Born
1 Jan 174445.0SelectedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
22 Jan 174445.0ConfirmedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
25 Oct 174445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
12 Nov 175051.8AppointedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
29 May 178384.4DiedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Kilkelly (Killikelly)
Bishop Peter Kilkelly (Killikelly) O.P. (born 1699, died ) Bishop of Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinvara, Co. Galway
Ordained BishopDominican, Convent, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)Dominican, Church, Galway

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,501
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast