Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Fernando Armindo Lugo Méndez, S.V.D.


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1951 Born
15 Aug 197726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
5 Mar 199442.7AppointedBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
17 Apr 199442.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
11 Jan 200553.6ResignedBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
30 Jun 200857.0Laicized

MicroData Summary for Fernando Armindo Lugo Méndez (VIAF: 46586726)
Mister Fernando Armindo Lugo Méndez S.V.D. (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro del Paraná
Ordained BishopCathedral, Asunción, Archdiocese of Asunción, Paraguay

  • a priest for 30.8 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 14.2 years (Laicized)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,422
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast