Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Santiago Benitez Avalos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Asunción, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1926Born
7 Jun 195226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
10 Aug 196135.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Asunción, Paraguay
10 Aug 196135.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Europa
24 Sep 196135.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Europa
4 Dec 196539.5AppointedBishop of Villarrica, Paraguay
20 May 198963.0AppointedArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
15 Jun 200276.1RetiredArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
19 Mar 200982.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Asunción, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Felipe Santiago Benitez Avalos
Archbishop Felipe Santiago Benitez Avalos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Asunción

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiribebuy
Ordained BishopAsunción, Archdiocese of Asunción

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast